Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC CITIZEN v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03166
Date Filed2020-11-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffPUBLIC CITIZEN
Case DescriptionPublic Citizen submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Labor for records concerning CY 2019 Form 300A data submitted to the Occupational Safety and Health Administration through the Injury Tracking Application. Public Citizen also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Public Citizen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-021COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7784645) filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to Attorney General, # 3 Summons to U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons to U.S. Department of Labor)(Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 11/02/2020)
2020-11-022LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC CITIZEN (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 11/02/2020)
2020-11-02Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/02/2020)
2020-11-033SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/03/2020)
2020-11-134NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Michael Tepe on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 11/13/2020)
2020-11-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/9/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/9/2020. (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 11/13/2020)
2020-11-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/09/2020. (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 11/13/2020)
2020-11-137RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR served on 11/9/2020 (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 11/13/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar