Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLinn County v. United States Forest Service et al
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityEugene
Case Number6:2020cv01889
Date Filed2020-11-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Michael J. McShane
PlaintiffLinn County a political subdivision of the State of Oregon
Case DescriptionLinn County submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Forest Service for records concerning the Beachie Creek Fire. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Linn County filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Forest Service an agency of the United States Department of Agriculture
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-021Complaint. Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for Violation of the Federal Freedom of Information Act Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7443437 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Linn County against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exs. A & B, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet). (DiLorenzo, John) (Entered: 11/02/2020)
2020-11-022Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 3/2/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/1/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 4/1/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (jw) (Entered: 11/02/2020)
2020-11-053Proposed Summons United States Forest Service Filed by Linn County. (DiLorenzo, John) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-054Proposed Summons United States Department of Agriculture Filed by Linn County. (DiLorenzo, John) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-055Proposed Summons United States Forest Service - Pacific NW Region Filed by Linn County. (DiLorenzo, John) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-056Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Forest Service. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jw) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-237Proposed Summons Ellen F. Rosenblum, Attorney General Department of Justice Filed by Linn County. (DiLorenzo, John) (Entered: 11/23/2020)
2020-11-238Proposed Summons William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States Department of Justice Filed by Linn County. (DiLorenzo, John) (Entered: 11/23/2020)
2020-11-239Application for Leave to Proceed IFP , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Ronald G. London. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7533921. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (DiLorenzo, John) (Entered: 11/23/2020)
2020-11-23NOTICE OF REGISTRATION REQUIREMENT. Ronald G. London is required to submit a request to e-file in the District of Oregon via PACER before this motion may be ruled upon or filing privileges granted. For instructions visit ord.uscourts.gov/prohac . (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 9 .) (ck) (Entered: 11/23/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar