Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCarson v. U.S. Merit Systems Protection Board
DistrictEastern District of Tennessee
CityKnoxville
Case Number3:2020cv00463
Date Filed2020-11-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Clifton L Corker
PlaintiffJoseph P Carson
Case DescriptionJoseph Carson submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Merit Systems Protection Board for records concerning the treatment of his whistleblower complaint. Carson also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but denied Carson's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Carson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. Merit Systems Protection Board
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-021COMPLAINT against U.S. Merit Systems Protection Board (Filing fee $ 400 PAID.), filed by Joseph P Carson. (Attachments: # 1 Other civil cover sheet, # 2 Other Envelope)(ABF) (Entered: 11/03/2020)
2020-11-032Summons Issued as to U.S. Merit Systems Protection Board and returned to Plaintiff by mail for service. (ABF) (Entered: 11/03/2020)
2020-11-033Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (c/m to Joseph P Carson, 10953 Twin Harbour Drive, Knoxville, TN 37934) (ABF) (Entered: 11/03/2020)
2020-11-034Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 11/3/20. (c/m to Joseph P Carson, 10953 Twin Harbour Drive, Knoxville, TN 37934) (ABF) (Entered: 11/03/2020)
2020-11-035Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 11/3/20. (c/m to Joseph P Carson, 10953 Twin Harbour Drive, Knoxville, TN 37934) (ABF) (Entered: 11/03/2020)
2020-11-036Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 11/3/20. (c/m to Joseph P Carson, 10953 Twin Harbour Drive, Knoxville, TN 37934) (ABF) (Entered: 11/03/2020)
2020-11-177SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph P Carson. U.S. Merit Systems Protection Board served on 11/4/2020. (ABF) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar