Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJOSEPH v. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03174
Date Filed2020-11-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffBERNARD JOSEPH
Case DescriptionBernard Joseph submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Army for records concerning email communications between Army G-1 and Defense Finance and Accounting System pertaining to Joseph's military pay entitlements. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and referred the request for processing. However, the HRC Fort Knox FOIA office subsequently told Joseph that it did not have his request. Joseph filed an administrative appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Joseph filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-031COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Fee Status: Paid, $400, Receipt No. BDCDC-7791574) filed by BERNARD JOSEPH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons, # 3 Summons Summons, # 4 Summons Summons)(Montalvo, Eric) Modified on 11/3/2020 to add in payment information.(ztnr) (Entered: 11/03/2020)
2020-11-03Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/03/2020)
2020-11-032SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/03/2020)
2020-11-043STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 4, 2020. (lcbah4) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar