Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMEDINA v. NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03178
Date Filed2020-11-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffTHOMAS MEDINA
Case DescriptionThomas Medina submitted FOIA requests to the National Guard Bureau and the Department of the Air Force for records concerning his involuntary removal from the Puerto Rico Air National Guard. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. The NGB told Medina that many of the responsive records were maintained by the Air Force. After hearing nothing further from the agency Medina filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL GUARD BUREAU
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-031COMPLAINT against All Defendants NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU and DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7793112) filed by THOMAS MEDINA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Montalvo, Eric) Modified on 11/4/2020 to add payment information (zsb). (Entered: 11/03/2020)
2020-11-042CIVIL COVER SHEET by THOMAS MEDINA filed by THOMAS MEDINA.(Montalvo, Eric) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
2020-11-04Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
2020-11-043SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, NATIONAL GUARD BUREAU, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
2020-11-174STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/17/20. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar