Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case Title MURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03186
Date Filed2020-11-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffMURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT a Virginia non-profit organization
Case DescriptionThe Murder Accountability Project submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records on the primary jurisdiction or the lead investigative group for murders and other violent crimes. MAP also sent similar requests to the National Park Service and the Bureau of Indian Affairs. The agencies acknowledged of the requests but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, MAP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantNATIONAL PARK SERVICE
DefendantBUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-041COMPLAINT against MURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7795060) filed by MURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh A FBI-FOIA Request2, # 2 Exhibit Exh B BIA FOIA Request2, # 3 Exhibit Exh C NPS FOIA Request2, # 4 Exhibit Exh D FBI Response 9-18-2020, # 5 Exhibit Exh E MAP Admin Appeal for FBI, # 6 Exhibit Exh F Confirmation of MAP Appeal delivery, # 7 Exhibit Exh G a-2021-02189, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Notice to Counsel/Party Notice, # 10 Summons FOIA-DOJ, # 11 Summons FOIA-FBI, # 12 Summons FOIA-NPS, # 13 Summons FOIA-BIA, # 14 Summons FOIA-DOI)(London, Ronald) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
2020-11-042NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT. Case related to Case No. 19-2478. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
2020-11-043ERRATA by MURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT 1 Complaint,, filed by MURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT. (London, Ronald) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
2020-11-04Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
2020-11-054SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-055SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-05SUMMONS Not Issued as to non-party U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General. (zmd) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 11/13/2020 (London, Ronald) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
2020-11-187RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/9/2020 (London, Ronald) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
2020-11-188RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS served on 11/13/2020 (London, Ronald) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
2020-11-189RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL PARK SERVICE served on 11/13/2020 (London, Ronald) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
2020-11-1810RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 11/9/2020 (London, Ronald) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
2020-11-1811REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint,, filed by MURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT. Related document: 1 Complaint,, filed by MURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT.(London, Ronald) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
2020-11-1812REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint,, filed by MURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT. Related document: 1 Complaint,, filed by MURDER ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT.(London, Ronald) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
2020-11-2013SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zjf) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar