Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleU.S. RIGHT TO KNOW v. NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03196
Date Filed2020-11-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffU.S. RIGHT TO KNOW
Case DescriptionUS Right to Know submitted a FOIA request to the National Institutes of Health for records concerning communications between federal employees mentioning keywords, such as Wuhan Institute of Virology. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). US Right to Know filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, US Right to Know filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-051COMPLAINT against NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7799645) filed by U.S. RIGHT TO KNOW. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons NIH Summons, # 4 Summons USAG Summons, # 5 Summons USAO Summons)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-06Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/06/2020)
2020-11-062SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/06/2020)
2020-12-013ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/1/2020. (DM) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar