Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03204
Date Filed2020-11-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
Case DescriptionThe American Civil Liberties Union submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the agency's response to COVID-19 in immigration detention facilities. The ACLU also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Public Interest Fee Waiver, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantIMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-061COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7803290) filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit Clarification Letter, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons ICE Summons, # 5 Summons DHS Summons)(Hentoff, Thomas) (Entered: 11/06/2020)
2020-11-062LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION (Hentoff, Thomas) (Entered: 11/06/2020)
2020-11-063NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas G. Gamse on behalf of AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION (Gamse, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/06/2020)
2020-11-064MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael Tan, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7803688. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of M. Tan, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gamse, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/06/2020)
2020-11-065NOTICE of Appearance by Suraj Kumar on behalf of AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION (Kumar, Suraj) (Entered: 11/06/2020)
2020-11-06Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/06/2020)
2020-11-066SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/06/2020)
2020-11-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Dkt. 4 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Michael Tan is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/6/2020. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 11/06/2020)
2020-11-127NOTICE of Appearance by Michael King Thomas Tan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tan, Michael) Modified on 11/13/2020 (zrdj). (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-138NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 11/13/2020)
2020-11-169STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/16/2020. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 11/16/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar