Maria Nancy Medina Rivera submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning her alien file. She also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied her request for expedited processing. Rivera submitted a second FOIA request to USCIS for her alien file, particularly documentation about her ex-husband. She requested expedited processing for the request as well. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but denied her request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Rivera filed suit. Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees
Defendant
William P Barr U.S. Attorney General
Defendant
Chad F Wolf Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Defendant
Kenneth T Cuccinelli Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Defendant
Jill Eggleston Chief FOIA Officer, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT (Titled: Complaint for Production Documents). Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18849459 filed by Maria Nancy Medina Rivera. (submitted by Benjamin Wiesinger) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-05
2
SUMMONS Submitted by Maria Nancy Medina Rivera. (submitted by Benjamin Wiesinger) (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons) (REK) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-05
3
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (REK) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2021-01-26
4
ORDER: Plaintiff shall have 14 days from the date this Order is filed to file a response to this Order and show cause why this action should not be dismissed as moot. If Plaintiff fails to file a response to this Order within 14 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 1/26/2021. (LMR) (Entered: 01/26/2021)
2021-02-05
5
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Maria Nancy Medina Rivera. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiesinger, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/05/2021)
2021-02-09
6
ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 5 ) is granted. Plaintiff's Complaint for Production Documents pursuant to 5 U.S.C. § 552(a)(4)(B) (Doc. 1 ) and this action are dismissed without prejudice in their entirety. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly and terminate this case. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/9/21. (SST) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-02-09
7
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed February 9, 2021, judgment is hereby entered and this action is dismissed without prejudice. (SST) (Entered: 02/09/2021)