Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFriends of Discovery Park v. United States Department of Housing and Urban Development
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2020cv01648
Date Filed2020-11-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Thomas S. Zilly
PlaintiffFriends of Discovery Park
Case DescriptionThe Friends of Discovery Park submitted four FOIA requests to the Department of Housing and Urban Development for records concerning communications between the agency, the Department of Defense, and the City of Seattle pertaining to Fort Lawton. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Friends of Discovery Park filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Housing and Urban Development
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [4]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-091COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Friends of Discovery Park United States Department of Housing and Urban Development (Receipt # AWAWDC-6724520) Attorney David A Bricklin added to party Friends of Discovery Park(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Discovery Park. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Bricklin, David) Modified on 11/10/2020 to correct party filing is against (KB). (Entered: 11/09/2020)
2020-11-092CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Friends of Discovery Park (Bricklin, David) (Entered: 11/09/2020)
2020-11-10Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (CDA) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2020-11-103Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant United States Department of Housing and Urban Development (CDA) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2020-11-134ORDER: To facilitate entry of an appropriate scheduling order in this matter, and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 and Local Civil Rule 16, counsel are directed to confer and to file a JOINT STATUS REPORT by Thursday 2/11/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW) (Entered: 11/13/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar