Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFAIRWARNING INC. et al v. NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03236
Date Filed2020-11-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffFAIRWARNING INC.
PlaintiffMYRON LEVIN
Case DescriptionFairwarning, Inc. submitted a FOIA request to the National Highway Safety and Traffic Administration for records concerning the Phase 2 guidelines for the agency's proposed visual manual driver distraction guidelines for portable and aftermarket devices. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing from the agency, Fairwarning, Inc. filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-101COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7815803) filed by FAIRWARNING INC., MYRON LEVIN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons William Barr, U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Summons NHTSA, # 4 Summons Michael Sherwin, U.S. Attorney)(Fried, Rachel) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2020-11-102LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FAIRWARNING INC. (Fried, Rachel) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2020-11-10Case Bates to Judge John D. Bates. (zmd) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2020-11-103SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2020-11-104RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/10/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/10/2020. (Fried, Rachel) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2020-11-175RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/16/2020. (Fried, Rachel) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
2020-11-176RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION served on 11/16/2020 (Fried, Rachel) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar