Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKENNY v. SCHRADING et al
DistrictDistrict of New Jersey
CityTrenton
Case Number3:2020cv15786
Date Filed2020-11-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Michael A. Shipp
PlaintiffFRANK J. KENNY, III
Case DescriptionFrank Kenny filed suit in state court in New Jersey, which involved allegations pertaining to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. However, this is not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantERIC SCHRADING
DefendantU.S. FISH & WILDLIFE SERVICE
DefendantCHRISTOPHER PORRINO
DefendantNEW JERSEY OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
DefendantDIVISION OF CONSUMER AFFAIRS
DefendantELIZABETH J. MACKAY
DefendantMICHAEL J. SIMON
DefendantSAMUEL R. VIAVATTINE
DefendantDANIEL SANTOS
DefendantNEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION
DefendantCATHERINE R. MCCABE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-101NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S. FISH & WILDLIFE SERVICE, ERIC SCHRADING from NJ Superior Court - Ocean County, case number OCN L 002086 20., filed by U.S. FISH & WILDLIFE SERVICE, ERIC SCHRADING. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Ocean County Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stinson, John) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2020-11-10Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (mg) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2020-11-112MOTION to Stay re 1 Notice of Removal, any answer or response to Complaint by ERIC SCHRADING, U.S. FISH & WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stinson, John) (Entered: 11/11/2020)
2020-11-12Set Deadlines as to 2 MOTION to Stay re 1 Notice of Removal, any answer or response to Complaint . Motion set for 12/7/2020 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar