Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCompton v. McDonald et al
DistrictNorthern District of Texas
CityFort Worth
Case Number4:2020cv01222
Date Filed2020-11-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Mark Pittman
PlaintiffJason Compton
Case DescriptionJason Compton submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning his file. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing from the agency, Compton filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Compton filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantRobert McDonald Secretary of the Dept of Veterans Affairs
DefendantWilliam A Hudson, Jr General Counsel of the Dept of Veterans Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-101COMPLAINT against William A Hudson, Jr, Robert McDonald filed by Jason Compton. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (twd) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2020-11-102MOTION for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Jason Compton. (See 1 for document). (twd) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2020-11-103New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Ray preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the national and circuit indexes.) File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (mmw) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2020-11-104Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mmw) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2020-11-10DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jason Compton. (see doc. 1 for image) (tln) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-125ORDER REQUIRING STATEMENT FROM PLAINTIFF: It is ORDERED that, by November 25, 2020, Compton shall file a pleading in this case stating whether he intended to file this case in addition to case no. 4:20-cv-01223-O-BP. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 11/12/2020) (plp) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-126Administrative Record consisting of Plaintiff Request To Withdraw Claim 01222-P 4-20-CV-01222-P-BP filed by Jason Compton. (Compton, Jason) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-137Findings and Recommendations on Case. A review of the record in this case reflects that Defendants have not filed an answer or a motion for summary judgment. The undersigned therefore RECOMMENDS that United States District Judge Mark T. Pittman direct the Clerk of Court to administratively close this case pursuant to Plaintiff's request. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 11/13/2020) (trt) (Entered: 11/13/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar