Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP v. UNITED STATES CENTRAL COMMAND J6-RDF (FOIA)
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03262
Date Filed2020-11-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Willkie Farr & Gallagher submitted 21 FOIA requests to U.S. Central Command for records concerning terrorist attacks in Iraq. The agency responded to some requests, but 14 requests remained unanswered. After the agency had still not responded to those requests, the law firm filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Fees, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES CENTRAL COMMAND J6-RDF (FOIA)
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-121COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CENTRAL COMMAND J6-RDF (FOIA) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7826457) filed by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Summons CENTCOM, # 4 Summons Civil Process Clerk, # 5 Exhibit 01 - FOIAs (Emails) submitted March 2, 2020, # 6 Exhibit 02 - Letter CENTCOM Follow Up to Previously Submitted FOIAs, # 7 Exhibit 03 - Signed Interim Letter 20-0252 - 20-0272, # 8 Exhibit 04 - FOIAs (Emails) Submitted May 1, 2020, # 9 Exhibit 05 - CENTCOM Letter dated May 6, 2020, # 10 Exhibit 06 - Status Report dated June 24, 2020, # 11 Exhibit 07 - CENTCOM Afghanistan Vendor Vetting Cell Request, # 12 Exhibit 08 - CENTCOM Charles Tiefer Request, # 13 Exhibit 09 - CENTCOM Commission on Wartime Contracting, # 14 Exhibit 10 - CENTCOM Contractor Debarment Request, # 15 Exhibit 11 - CENTCOM Gert Berthold Request, # 16 Exhibit 12 - CENTCOM Joint Chiefs Counter Threat Finance Submissions Request, # 17 Exhibit 13 - CENTCOM Senate Report Request, # 18 Exhibit 14 - CENTCOM Specific Documents List Request, # 19 Exhibit 15 - CENTCOM Taliban Mobile Phone Request, # 20 Exhibit 16 - CENTCOM TF2010 Request, # 21 Exhibit 17 - CENTCOM Tom Creal Request, # 22 Exhibit 18 - CENTCOM USA Today FOIA Request, # 23 Exhibit 19 - CENTCOM MTN PowerPoint Request, # 24 Exhibit 20 - CENTCOM Cable Request with Attachment 1, # 25 Exhibit 21 - July 28 Email, July 29 Email, CCJ6-RD Referral Notice 20-0255, # 26 Exhibit 22 - March 13, 2020 Interim Letter re FOIA 20-0273)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-122LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-12Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CENTRAL COMMAND J6-RDF (FOIA), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-174STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/17/20. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar