Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMARTINEZ v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03269
Date Filed2020-11-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffFREDDY MARTINEZ
Case DescriptionFreddy Martinez, an investigative journalist, submitted FOIA requests to the FBI for records concerning Whitey Bulger. The FBI acknowledged receipt of the request and told Martinez that if he would narrow the scope of the request it could respond more quickly. Martinez declined to narrow the scope and asked the FBI for a fee estimate. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Martinez filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-121COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7827881) filed by FREDDY MARTINEZ. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-122NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of FREDDY MARTINEZ (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-123NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of FREDDY MARTINEZ (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-13Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb) (Entered: 11/13/2020)
2020-11-134SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/13/2020)
2020-12-235RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/30/2020 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-236RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 11/30/2020 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-237RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/30/2020. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-238RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/30/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/30/2020. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-289Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Truong, John) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
2020-12-29MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 9 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before January 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/29/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2020-12-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or Responsive Pleading due by 1/29/2021. (zjd) (Entered: 12/31/2020)
2021-01-2910ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Truong, John) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
2021-01-3111ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before February 16, 2021. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for a stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/31/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 01/31/2021)
2021-02-1612STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 02/16/2021)
2021-02-1613WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 2/17/2021.....Joint STATUS REPORT by FREDDY MARTINEZ. (Topic, Matthew) Modified on 2/18/2021 (eg). (Entered: 02/16/2021)
2021-02-17MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by April 16, 2021, that updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/17/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 02/17/2021)
2021-02-1714NOTICE of Withdrawal re 13 Status Report by FREDDY MARTINEZ (Topic, Matthew) Modified to add link on 2/19/2021 (znmw). (Entered: 02/17/2021)
2021-04-0615NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney John Truong (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
2021-04-1616Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 04/16/2021)
2021-04-19MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by June 15, 2021, that updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/19/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 04/19/2021)
2021-06-1517Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 06/15/2021)
2021-06-15MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by August 16, 2021, that updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/15/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 06/15/2021)
2021-08-1618Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 08/16/2021)
2021-08-16MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by October 15, 2021, that updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/16/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 08/16/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar