Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDavis v. Executive Office for Immigration Review
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityBaltimore
Case Number1:2020cv03254
Date Filed2020-11-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge James K. Bredar
PlaintiffTimothy W. Davis
Case DescriptionTimothy Davis, an immigration attorney, submitted FOIA requests to the Executive Office for Immigration Review for records concerning the immigration court files for a number of his clients. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Davis filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantExecutive Office for Immigration Review
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-101COMPLAINT against Executive Office for Immigration Review ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637125612.), filed by Timothy W. Davis.(slss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-122Summons Issued 60 days as to Executive Office for Immigration Review, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(slss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-243SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy W. Davis. Executive Office for Immigration Review served on 11/17/2020, answer due 1/19/2021.(Davis, Timothy) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar