Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCrow v. Internal Revenue Service
DistrictDistrict of Idaho
CityDatabaseVersion 6.3 Boise - Southern
Case Number1:2020cv00518
Date Filed2020-11-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge David C. Nye
PlaintiffStanley D. Crow
Case DescriptionStanley Crow submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning the case activity record since February 22, 2019 pertaining to the agency's examination of him. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency disclosed 23 pages. While the response letter explained the exemptions, none of the redactions were linked to exemptions. Crow filed an administrative appeal. The agency denied the appeal. Crow then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantInternal Revenue Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-121COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-2127550.), filed by Stanley D. Crow. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons)(Krug, Haley)
2020-11-162Summons Issued as to Internal Revenue Service (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)
2020-11-163CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stanley D. Crow re 2 Summons Issued as to USA, 1 Complaint, (Krug, Haley)
2020-11-254AFFIDAVIT of Service for Issued Summons and Complaint served on Internal Revenue Service on 11/17/2020, filed by Stanley D. Crow. (Krug, Haley)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar