Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN IDEAS INSTITUTE et al v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03281
Date Filed2020-11-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffAMERICAN IDEAS INSTITUTE
PlaintiffBARBARA BOLAND
Case DescriptionThe American Ideas Institute, which publishes the American Conservative magazine, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning a foiled coup in Venezuela in May 2020 which involved former U.S. military personnel. AII also requested a fee waiver and expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency granted the request for a fee waiver but denied the request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, AII filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-131COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7830695) filed by THE AMERICAN IDEAS INSTITUTE, BARBARA BOLAND. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Rule 7.1 certification, # 3 Summons State, # 4 Summons USADC, # 5 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 11/13/2020)
2020-11-13Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 11/13/2020)
2020-11-132SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/13/2020)
2020-12-163RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 11/19/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit State receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
2020-12-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/19/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/19/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USADC receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
2020-12-215Civil Statement United States of America from United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USAO/DC FRCP 4 Letter to DDC Court Clerk, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 12/21/2020)
2020-12-22MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 5 proposal and agreed-upon due date for Defendant's Answer. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint by January 20, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/22/2020. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 12/22/2020)
2020-12-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/20/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-306NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Brudy-Everett on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
2021-01-197ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-19MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a proposed briefing schedule by February 2, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/19/2021. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 2/2/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 01/21/2021)
2021-02-028Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 02/02/2021)
2021-02-03MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 8 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by April 2, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/3/2021. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 02/03/2021)
2021-02-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/2/2021. (nbn) (Entered: 02/03/2021)
2021-04-029Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 04/02/2021)
2021-04-05MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 9 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by June 1, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/5/2021. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 04/05/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar