Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMADOR v. BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, AND FIREARMS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03321
Date Filed2020-11-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffGABRIEL AMADOR
DefendantBUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, AND FIREARMS Chief disclosure Division
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-13Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/13/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
2020-11-131COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, AND FIREARMS filed by GABRIEL AMADOR. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
2020-11-132MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by GABRIEL AMADOR (adh, ) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
2020-11-303PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/30/2020. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-12-104MOTION for Extension of Time to File by GABRIEL AMADOR (adh, ) (Entered: 12/11/2020)
2020-12-305NOTICE filed by GABRIEL AMADOR.(adh, ) Modified event title on 1/5/2021 (znmw). (Entered: 12/31/2020)
2021-02-12Filing fee received: $ 350, receipt number: 4616105038. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/16/2021)
2021-02-16Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/16/2021)
2021-02-166NOTICE regarding Change of Address by GABRIEL AMADOR. (ztth) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
2021-02-227SUMMONS (3) Issued as to BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, AND FIREARMS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, sent to U.S Marshall service. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar