Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03314
Date Filed2020-11-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted FOIA requests to the CIA, the Department of Defense, the Department of Energy, the Department of Justice, the Office of the Director of National Intelligence, the Department of State, and the Department of Treasury for records concerning requests to unmask the identity of Michael Flynn in intelligence reports. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-161COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7838212) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/16/2020)
2020-11-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/16/2020)
2020-11-163NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Case related to Case No. 1:20-CV-01729. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/16/2020)
2020-11-17Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
2020-11-174NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Leigh Di Liberto on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
2020-11-175SUMMONS (9) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
2020-11-246RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/23/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/23/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-247RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/23/20. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-248RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 11/23/2020; OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE served on 11/23/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 11/23/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY served on 11/23/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/23/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 11/23/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 11/23/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-12-239NOTICE of Appearance by Antonia Marie Konkoly on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Konkoly, Antonia) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-2310ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Konkoly, Antonia) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-28MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by January 18, 2021. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/28/2020. (lctjk1) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
2021-01-1411Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Konkoly, Antonia) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by March 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/15/2021. (lctjk1) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar