Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSTONEHILL v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03327
Date Filed2020-11-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffPAULINE DALE STONEHILL Co-Executor and Co-Special Administrator, Estate of Harry S. Stonehill
Case DescriptionPauline Stonehill, a co-executor of the estate of Harry Stonehill, submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for records concerning Harry Stonehill, Menhart Spielman, Jose Lukban, and Damasco Norton from 1955 through 1974. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Stonehill filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-161COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by PAULINE DALE STONEHILL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons CIA Summons, # 3 Summons Attorney General Summons, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney DC Summons, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 1- October 11, 2018 FOIA)(Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 11/16/2020)
2020-11-17Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number: ADCDC-7844728. (zsb) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
2020-11-18Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsb) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
2020-11-182SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
2020-11-183ERRATA by PAULINE DALE STONEHILL 1 Complaint, filed by PAULINE DALE STONEHILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit exhibit to Errata)(Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
2020-11-274RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/27/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/27/2020. (Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 11/27/2020)
2020-11-275RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/23/2020. (Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 11/27/2020)
2020-11-276RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 11/23/2020 (Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 11/27/2020)
2020-11-307NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-12-228ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 12/22/2020)
2020-12-229ORDER directing the Government to file a Vaughn index and any supporting dispositive motions by 1/21/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/22/2020. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 12/22/2020)
2021-01-2010STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 01/20/2021)
2021-01-21MINUTE ORDER: The 1/21/2021 deadline to file a Vaughn Index and any supporting dispositive motions is hereby VACATED. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than 3/12/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/21/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 01/21/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar