Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCATO INSTITUTE v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03338
Date Filed2020-11-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffCATO INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Cato Institute submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records mentioning the Cato Institute and containing a list of search topics. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Cato Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-171COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7846140) filed by CATO INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
2020-11-172NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of CATO INSTITUTE (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
2020-11-173NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of CATO INSTITUTE (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
2020-11-18Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
2020-11-184SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
2020-12-235RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/30/2020 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-236RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 11/30/2020 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-237RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/30/2020. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-238RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/30/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/30/2020. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-309NOTICE of Appearance by Tanya D. Senanayake on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Senanayake, Tanya) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
2020-12-3010ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Senanayake, Tanya) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
2020-12-31MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a proposed briefing schedule by January 14, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/31/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 12/31/2020)
2020-12-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 1/14/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 01/06/2021)
2021-01-1411PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Joint Filing by Parties) by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Senanayake, Tanya) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-14MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 11 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by February 15, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/14/2021. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/15/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-02-1512Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Senanayake, Tanya) (Entered: 02/15/2021)
2021-02-16MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 12 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by March 17, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/16/2021. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 02/16/2021)
2021-02-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/17/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 02/16/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar