Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRuza v. Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
DistrictWestern District of Michigan
CitySouthern Division
Case Number1:2020cv01113
Date Filed2020-11-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Hala Y. Jarbou
PlaintiffSteven Barry Ruza
Case DescriptionSteven Ruza submitted a series of FOIA requests to the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Ruza filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantConsumer Financial Protection Bureau
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-181COMPLAINT against Consumer Financial Protection Bureau filed by Steven Barry Ruza (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (pjw) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
2020-11-182APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (pjw) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
2020-11-203NOTICE of receipt of case (pjw) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
2020-11-20Copy of Receipt of Case Notice 3 sent via U.S. Mail to Steven Ruza (tlbu) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
2020-11-244ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-25Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 4 sent via U.S. Mail to Steven Barry Ruza (jmw) (Entered: 11/25/2020)
2020-11-25(DISREGARD) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Consumer Financial Protection Bureau and delivered to US Marshal for service (pjw) Modified text on 12/8/2020 (eod) (Entered: 11/25/2020)
2020-12-08SUMMONS ISSUED as to Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and delivered to US Marshal for service (eod) (Entered: 12/08/2020)
2021-01-155MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendant Consumer Financial Protection Bureau; (Long, Jeanne) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-156BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim 5 filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Adams Declaration) (Long, Jeanne) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-157CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion, 6 filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (Long, Jeanne) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-158CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Consumer Financial Protection Bureau re Brief in Support of a Motion, 6 , Certificate of Compliance Regarding Word Count 7 , MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim 5 (Long, Jeanne) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-159ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; signed by District Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (haw) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-19Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge 9 sent via U.S. Mail to Steven Barry Ruza (jmw) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-02-0810ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Consumer Financial Protection Bureau served on 12/17/2020, answer due 2/16/2021 (pjw) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar