Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEWIS v. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03372
Date Filed2020-11-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffPENNEY LEWIS
Case DescriptionPenney Lewis submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records about herself. Lewis was the Branch Chief of the Office of Professional Responsibility at CBP when a subordinate accused her of creating a hostile work environment. Although the subordinate's EEO complaint was not substantiated, Lewis claimed the agency continued to harass her, even after she took a job at another agency. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Lewis filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-201COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7861449) filed by PENNEY LEWIS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
2020-11-20Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
2020-11-202SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
2020-11-243STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 24, 2020. (lcbah1) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-304RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General November 28, 2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-11-305RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/28/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/28/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-11-306RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 11/24/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Byrnes, Kevin) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-12-287MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
2020-12-298NOTICE of Plaintiff's Consent to Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2020-12-30MINUTE ORDER (paperless) granting defendant's 7 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond and DIRECTING defendant to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's 1 Complaint by February 11, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 30, 2020. (lcbah1) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
2020-12-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 2/11/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
2021-02-119ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION.(Moustakas, John) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar