Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHooker v. USDOJ - Executive Office of United States Attorneys
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityTampa
Case Number8:2020cv02749
Date Filed2020-11-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Steven D. Merryday
PlaintiffCarlton Eugene Hooker, Jr.
Case DescriptionCarleton Hooker submitted a FOIA request to the Executive Office of U.S. Attorneys for records concerning evidence in the possession of an Assistant U.S. Attorney. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Hooker filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUSDOJ - Executive Office of United States Attorneys
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-201COMPLAINT against USDOJ - Executive Office of United States Attorneys filed by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Summons, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet). Filing fee not paid and no IFP motion filed. (JLD) (Entered: 11/23/2020)
2020-11-232RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 11/23/2020. (KAC) (Entered: 11/23/2020)
2020-12-073NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 2 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. Related case(s): yes. (AG) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2020-12-234ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's Standing Order Regarding Assignment of Cases filed in Case No.: 8:14-mc-51-JSM, the Clerk of the Court is instructed to reassign this case to another District Judge under the blind filing system established pursuant to the rules of this Court. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 12/23/2020. (SMB) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-295Case Reassigned to Judge Steven D. Merryday. New case number: 8:20-cv-2749-T-23TGW. Judge James S. Moody, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (JNB) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2021-01-116NOTICE: COMPLIANCE WITH NEW LOCAL RULE 1.08. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/11/2021. (GSO) (Entered: 01/11/2021)
2021-01-227MOTION for Summary Judgment by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(JLD) (Entered: 01/25/2021)
2021-02-228ORDER directing Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr., by 3/12/2021 , either to pay the filing fee or to move to proceed in forma pauperis ; directing Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr., by 3/19/2021 , to show cause why an order should not dismiss this action for failure to timely effect service. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/22/2021. (BK) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar