Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHooker v. Department of Veterans Affairs
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityTampa
Case Number8:2020cv02750
Date Filed2020-11-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Steven D. Merryday
PlaintiffCarlton Eugene Hooker, Jr.
Case DescriptionCarleton Hooker submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning a VA police investigative report pertaining to himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency disclosed a two-page copy of the report. Carleton filed an administrative appeal, claiming it was not the original report he had requested. The agency denied Carleton's appeal. Carleton then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantDepartment of Veterans Affairs
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-221COMPLAINT against Department of Veterans Affairs filed by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Summons, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet). Filing fee not paid and no IFP motion filed.(JLD) (Entered: 11/23/2020)
2020-11-242NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-243ORDER re 2 --notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/24/2020. (GSO) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-254ORDER directing Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr., by 12/4/2020 , either to submit the $400 filing fee or to move for leave to proceed in forma pauperis . Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/25/2020. (BK) (Entered: 11/25/2020)
2020-12-045MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. (AG) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 12/04/2020)
2021-01-056ENDORSED ORDER re 5 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Carlton Eugene Hooker, Jr. Plaintiff is directed to complete and file a financial affidavit within twenty (20) days from the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to mail a financial affidavit form to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 01/05/2021. (TAM) (Entered: 01/05/2021)
2021-01-117NOTICE: COMPLIANCE WITH NEW LOCAL RULE 1.08. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/11/2021. (GSO) (Entered: 01/11/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar