Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMOORE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03423
Date Filed2020-11-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffLAMAR MOORE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-23Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/23/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-231COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE with Jury Demand filed by LAMAR MOORE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (zmd) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-232MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LAMAR MOORE. (zmd) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-12-113PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/11/2020. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar