Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJAMES MADISON PROJECT et al v. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03487
Date Filed2020-11-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffJAMES MADISON PROJECT
PlaintiffNOAH SHACHTMAN
Case DescriptionThe James Madison Project and Noah Shachtman, a reporter for the Daily Beast, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Interior for records concerning a tweet that was authorized by the Department of Interior. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request by after hearing nothing further from the agency, JMP and Shachtman filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-301COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7896605) filed by THE JAMES MADISON PROJECT, NOAH SHACHTMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Rule 7.1 certification, # 3 Summons Interior, # 4 Summons USADC, # 5 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-12-01Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2020-12-012LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NOAH SHACHTMAN, THE JAMES MADISON PROJECT (adh, ) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2020-12-013SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2020-12-154RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/7/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USAG receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
2020-12-155RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 12/7/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Interior receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
2020-12-156RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/7/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/6/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USADC receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
2020-12-157GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 15, 2020. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
2021-01-068ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2021)
2021-01-11MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before February 8, 2021, the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule governing further proceedings. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 11, 2021. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 01/11/2021)
2021-01-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 1/8/2021 (hs) (Entered: 01/11/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar