Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINSTITUTE FOR CONSTITUTIONAL ADVOCACY AND PROTECTION v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03491
Date Filed2020-12-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffINSTITUTE FOR CONSTITUTIONAL ADVOCACY AND PROTECTION
Case DescriptionThe Institute for Constitutional Advocacy and Protection submitted a FOIA request for records concerning the action memo submitted to the Assistant Secretary for Consular Affairs in connection with the drafting of the June 2019 Federal Register Notice entitled Visas: Diversity Immigrants. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told ICAP that the request fell under the unusual circumstances exception. After hearing nothing further from the agency, ICAP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-011COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7900238) filed by INSTITUTE FOR CONSTITUTIONAL ADVOCACY AND PROTECTION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit Ex. A ICAP FOIA Request)(Wayne, Seth) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2020-12-01Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2020-12-012SUMMONS(3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2020-12-073RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/2/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/1/2021. (Wayne, Seth) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2020-12-144RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/08/2020. (Wayne, Seth) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2020-12-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 12/8/2020 (Wayne, Seth) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
2020-12-296Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2020-12-30MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 6 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by February 3, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/30/2020. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
2020-12-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/3/2021 (lsj) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar