Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC. et al v. U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03499
Date Filed2020-12-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffFIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC.
TERMINATED: 01/07/2021
PlaintiffLEE FANG
PlaintiffFIRST LOOK INSTITUTE, INC.
Case DescriptionLee Fang, a reporter for The Intercept, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Agency for Global Media for records concerning the politicization of the agency by its recently appointed director, Michael Pack. Fang also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, First Look Media Works and Fang filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-011COMPLAINT against U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7901719) filed by FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC., LEE FANG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Braverman, Burt) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/16/2020) (adh, ). (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2020-12-02Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2020-12-022SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2020-12-163RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/08/2020. (Braverman, Burt) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
2020-12-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/2/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/1/2021. (Braverman, Burt); Modified text and date of service on 12/17/2020 (ztth). (Entered: 12/16/2020)
2020-12-285NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of All Defendants (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
2020-12-316ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA.(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 12/31/2020)
2021-01-057Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by LEE FANG, FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David S. Bralow, # 2 Exhibit A to Bralow Declaration, # 3 Amended Complaint, # 4 Amended Complaint (redlined), # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Braverman, Burt) (Entered: 01/05/2021)
2021-01-07MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Consent 7 Motion to Amend Complaint as a Matter of Course. It is hereby ORDERED that the 7 Motion is granted and the Clerk of Court is directed to file on the docket the Plaintiffs Amended Complaint, ECF No. 7-3. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/7/2021. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
2021-01-078AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA filed by LEE FANG, FIRST LOOK INSTITUTE, INC. (ztth); Modified text on 1/8/2021 (ztth). (Entered: 01/07/2021)
2021-01-139Amended ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint by U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA.(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 01/13/2021)
2021-01-14MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by February 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/14/2021. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 2/20/2021. (zkh) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-1510LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FIRST LOOK INSTITUTE, INC. (Braverman, Burt) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-2111MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas R. Burke, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-8105468. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by LEE FANG, FIRST LOOK INSTITUTE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Thomas R. Burke, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Braverman, Burt) (Entered: 01/21/2021)
2021-01-2612Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Defendant, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 01/26/2021)
2021-01-28MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Thomas R. Burke is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Furthermore, upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a f urther joint status report by February 27, 2021. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/28/21. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/28/2021)
2021-02-0213NOTICE of Appearance by Meenakshi Krishnan on behalf of LEE FANG, FIRST LOOK INSTITUTE, INC. (Krishnan, Meenakshi) (Entered: 02/02/2021)
2021-02-2614Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA. (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 02/26/2021)
2021-03-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by April 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/2/21. (lctjk2) (Entered: 03/02/2021)
2021-04-0115Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. AGENCY FOR GLOBAL MEDIA. (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 04/01/2021)
2021-04-12MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, no later than May 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/12/21. (lctjk2) (Entered: 04/12/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar