Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDUDA v. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03510
Date Filed2020-12-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffKELLY DUDA
Case DescriptionKelley Duda, a documentary filmmaker, submitted two FOIA requests to the National Archives and Records Administration for records concerning a file entitled Tainted Blood/Cummins Prison, Arkansas, which was contained in records of Independent Counsel Kenneth Starr, Robert Ray, and Julie Thomas. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency told Duda that her first request involved about 100 pages. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Duda filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-021COMPLAINT against NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7908344) filed by KELLY DUDA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons as to National Archives and Records Administration, # 5 Summons as to United States Attorney, # 6 Summons as to United States Attorney General)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/3/2020) (rj). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/3/2020) (ztnr). (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/3/2020) (ztnr). Modified on 12/3/2020 TO FLATTEN PDFS(rj). (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2020-12-03Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2020-12-032SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2020-12-223NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Brudy-Everett on behalf of NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION (Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 12/22/2020)
2021-01-134NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Alexander Marshall on behalf of KELLY DUDA (Marshall, Adam) (Entered: 01/13/2021)
2021-01-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/14/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/13/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/14/20. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing as to U.S. Attorney, # 2 Affidavit of Mailing as to U.S. Attorney General)(Marshall, Adam) (Entered: 01/13/2021)
2021-01-136ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 01/13/2021)
2021-01-14MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA requests, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the requests and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before January 28, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 14, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-257NOTICE of Appearance by Gunita Singh on behalf of KELLY DUDA (Singh, Gunita) (Entered: 01/25/2021)
2021-01-288Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 01/28/2021)
2021-01-28MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before March 29, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 28, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 01/28/2021)
2021-03-299Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 03/29/2021)
2021-03-29MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before May 28, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 29, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 03/29/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar