Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLorfils v. U.S. Attorney General et al
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityFt Lauderdale
Case Number0:2020cv62463
Date Filed2020-12-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge William P. Dimitrouleas
PlaintiffMagliore Lorfils
Case DescriptionMagliore Lorfils submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning his removal proceeding. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Lorfils files suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Attorney General William Barr
DefendantDirector, Executive Office for Immigration Review James McHenry
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-021COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13966431, filed by Magliore Lorfils . (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Signed Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s) Proposed Summons, # 3 Summon(s) Proposed Summons, # 4 Exhibit Acknowledgement of receipt of FOIA Request)(Stoller, David) Modified on 12/3/2020 (jao). (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2020-12-022Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao) Modified on 12/3/2020 (jao). (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2020-12-033Summons Issued as to Director, Executive Office for Immigration Review, U.S. Attorney General(jao) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2020-12-314SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Magliore Lorfils. Director, Executive Office for Immigration Review served on 12/7/2020, answer due 2/5/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Stoller, David) (Entered: 12/31/2020)
2020-12-315SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Magliore Lorfils. U.S. Attorney General served on 12/28/2020, answer due 2/26/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Stoller, David) (Entered: 12/31/2020)
2020-12-316SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Magliore Lorfils. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Stoller, David) (Entered: 12/31/2020)
2021-01-067Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 1 Complaint, by Director, Executive Office for Immigration Review, U.S. Attorney General. Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party Director, Executive Office for Immigration Review(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party U.S. Attorney General(pty:dft). (Raurell, Carlos) (Entered: 01/06/2021)
2021-01-078PAPERLESS ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. Director, Executive Office for Immigration Review and U.S. Attorney General shall file their Responses/Answers to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint on or before 1/22/2021. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/7/2021. (mp00) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar