Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNatural Resources Defense Council, Inc. v. U.S. Department of the Interior
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2020cv10140
Date Filed2020-12-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John P. Cronan
PlaintiffNatural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe Natural Resources Defense Council submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Interior for records concerning the agency's decision to change its interpretation of an exception in the Coastal Barrier Resources Act that allowed development of barrier islands only to protect wildlife. NRDC also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted NRDC's request for a fee waiver. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, NRDC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of the Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-021COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of the Interior. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22856079)Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc...(Wang, Vivian) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2020-12-022CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wang, Vivian) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2020-12-023REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of the Interior, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc...(Wang, Vivian) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2020-12-024FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Attorney General, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc...(Wang, Vivian) Modified on 12/3/2020 (sj). (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2020-12-025FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc...(Wang, Vivian) Modified on 12/3/2020 (sj). (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2020-12-026RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc...(Wang, Vivian) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2020-12-03CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(sj) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2020-12-03Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (sj) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2020-12-03Case Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2020-12-037ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of the Interior. (sj) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2020-12-03***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Vivian Huei-Wen Wang to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Request for Issuance of Summons, 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summons are only issued to active parties to the case. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar