Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLOUISE TRAUMA CENTER LLC v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03517
Date Filed2020-12-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffLOUISE TRAUMA CENTER LLC
Case DescriptionThe Louise Trauma Center submitted four FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning the Brief Bank and other litigation materials. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Louise Trauma Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-031COMPLAINT LOUISE TRAUMA CENTER LLC against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7911704) filed by LOUISE TRAUMA CENTER LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2020-12-032CIVIL COVER SHEET by LOUISE TRAUMA CENTER LLC re 1 Complaint, filed by LOUISE TRAUMA CENTER LLC. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by LOUISE TRAUMA CENTER LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2020-12-03Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2020-12-033SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2020-12-044RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/4/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/3/2021. (Cleveland, David) (Entered: 12/04/2020)
2020-12-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/15/2020. (Cleveland, David) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
2020-12-166RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 12/15/2020 (Cleveland, David) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
2020-12-317NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell C. Valdez on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 12/31/2020)
2020-12-318MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 12/31/2020)
2020-12-31ORDER granting 8 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that the Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before January 18, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/31/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/31/2020)
2020-12-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/18/2021. (tj) (Entered: 12/31/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar