Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case Title CENTER FOR MEDIA AND DEMOCRACY v. UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03519
Date Filed2020-12-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffCENTER FOR MEDIA AND DEMOCRACY a Wisconsin non-profit organization
Case DescriptionThe Center for Media and Democracy submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for records concerning Part XV of certain IRS form 990s pertaining to tax-exempt organizations. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told CMD to request the records using IRS Form 4506-A. CMD filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CMD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-031CIVIL COVER SHEET by CENTER FOR MEDIA AND DEMOCRACY filed by CENTER FOR MEDIA AND DEMOCRACY.(DeThomas, Courtney) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2020-12-032COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7912696) filed by CENTER FOR MEDIA AND DEMOCRACY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Summons)(DeThomas, Courtney) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2020-12-033NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CENTER FOR MEDIA AND DEMOCRACY. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-01010. (DeThomas, Courtney) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2020-12-04ENTERED IN ERROR.....Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/04/2020)
2020-12-04Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/04/2020)
2020-12-044SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/04/2020)
2021-01-155RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTER FOR MEDIA AND DEMOCRACY served on 12/14/2020 (DeThomas, Courtney) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-156RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/14/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/15/2021. (DeThomas, Courtney) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-157RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/13/2021. (DeThomas, Courtney) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar