Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLlamas et al v. U.S. Department of Justice
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityOrlando
Case Number6:2020cv02221
Date Filed2020-12-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carlos E. Mendoza
PlaintiffNoelle Llamas
PlaintiffKen Klippenstein
Case DescriptionNoelle Llamas and Ken Klippenstein submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning annual totals of crime reports for the unauthorized disclosure of classified information. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Llamas and Klippenstein filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-051COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17628715) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Proposed Summons William Barr, # 5 Proposed Summons U.S. Department of Justice, # 6 Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney's Office, Middle District of Florida)(Bourdon, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/05/2020)
2020-12-072NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:20-cv-2221-Orl-41LRH. (SJB) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2020-12-073SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ARJ) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2020-12-074RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/21/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/7/2020. (MEH) ctp (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2020-12-075NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/7/2020. (MEH) ctp (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2020-12-076STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/6/2020. (MKH) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2020-12-087NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 4 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ken Klippenstein, Noelle Llamas. Related case(s): no (Bourdon, Elizabeth) Modified text and linked order on 12/8/2020 (ARJ). (Entered: 12/08/2020)
2021-01-048SCHEDULING ORDER- On or before Friday February 26, 2021, Plaintiffs shall file an opening brief of twenty-five or fewer pages; On or before March 29, 2021, Defendants shall file a responsive brief of twenty or fewer pages; and On or before April 12, 2021, Plaintiff may file a reply brief of five or fewer pages. A hearing will be set at the Court's discretion. If the parties believe that this case should be redesignated as a Track Two case, they must file a motion requesting such redesignation. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/4/2021. (MEH) ctp (Entered: 01/04/2021)
2021-01-139ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. Department of Justice.(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 01/13/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar