Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCenter for Food Safety v. Environmental Protection Agency
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2020cv08601
Date Filed2020-12-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson
PlaintiffCenter for Food Safety
Case DescriptionThe Center for Food Safety submitted four FOIA requests to the EPA for records concerning the EPA's decision-making process regarding the registration of dicamba pesticides on April 12 and April 29, 2019, June 17, 2019, and February 11, 2020. CFS also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CFS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantEnvironmental Protection Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-041COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number 0971-15276979.). Filed by Center for Food Safety. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Yundt, Victoria) (Filed on 12/4/2020) Modified on 12/7/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/04/2020)
2020-12-042Proposed Summons. (Yundt, Victoria) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)
2020-12-043Certificate of Interested Entities by Center for Food Safety (Yundt, Victoria) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)
2020-12-044Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Food Safety (Yundt, Victoria) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)
2020-12-075Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/21/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2020) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2020-12-076Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/25/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2020) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2020-12-077Summons Issued as to Environmental Protection Agency. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2020) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2020-12-218CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Center for Food Safety.. (Yundt, Victoria) (Filed on 12/21/2020) (Entered: 12/21/2020)
2021-01-049SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center for Food Safety. Environmental Protection Agency served on 12/14/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Yundt, Victoria) (Filed on 1/4/2021) (Entered: 01/04/2021)
2021-01-0810NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Zack (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 1/8/2021) (Entered: 01/08/2021)
2021-01-0811STIPULATION to Extend Deadline within which to Answer or Respond filed by Environmental Protection Agency. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 1/8/2021) (Entered: 01/08/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar