Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSatish Gupta v Gupta Hahn
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2020cv11083
Date Filed2020-12-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James V. Selna
PlaintiffSatish Steve Gupta
Case DescriptionSatish Gupta submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning forms submitted by Moderna. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but denied it under Exemption 4 (confidential business information). Gupta filed an administrative appeal. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Gupta filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantStephen Hahn Commissioner of Food and Drug Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-071COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29384400 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Satish Steve Gupta. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit) (Attorney Lawrence Alan Widdis added to party Satish Steve Gupta(pty:pla))(Widdis, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2020-12-072CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Satish Steve Gupta. (Widdis, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2020-12-073Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiff Satish Steve Gupta. (Widdis, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2020-12-074CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Satish Steve Gupta, identifying None. (Widdis, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2020-12-085NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap) (Entered: 12/08/2020)
2020-12-086NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 12/08/2020)
2020-12-08730 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant Stephen Hahn. (ghap) (Entered: 12/08/2020)
2020-12-088NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Complaint 1 there is no signature by attorney. (ghap) (Entered: 12/08/2020)
2020-12-099INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
2020-12-1710First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Stephen Hahn amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , filed by Plaintiff Satish Steve Gupta(Widdis, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2021-01-1511STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Stephen Hahn answer now due 2/18/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendant Stephen Hahn.(Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party Stephen Hahn(pty:dft))(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-1512Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 3/1/2021 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 2/22/2021. (lb) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar