Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMuckRock Foundation, Inc. et al v. Department of State
DistrictDistrict of Massachusetts
CityBoston
Case Number1:2020cv12170
Date Filed2020-12-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Allison D. Burroughs
PlaintiffMuckRock Foundation, Inc.
PlaintiffPrivacy International
Case DescriptionMuckRock Foundation and Privacy International submitted seven FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning foreign surveillance assistance programs provided to other countries by the United States. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, MuckRock Foundation and Privacy International filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-071COMPLAINT For Injunctive Relief against Department of State Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8541125 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by MuckRock Foundation, Inc., Privacy International. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-G, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 JS45 Local Category Form, # 4 DOS Summons, # 5 AG Summons, # 6 AUSA Summons)(Kortz, Mason) Modified on 12/7/2020: corrected docket text (Kelly, Danielle). (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2020-12-072ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2020-12-073Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2021-02-084Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 26, 2021 to File Answer by Department of State.(Weida, Jason) (Entered: 02/08/2021)
2021-02-085Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Department of State answer due 2/26/2021. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 02/08/2021)
2021-02-266ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Department of State.(Weida, Jason) (Entered: 02/26/2021)
2021-03-017Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The parties are to submit a joint proposed schedule by 3/11/21 and indicate whether they object to the court setting a schedule on the written submission.(Folan, Karen) (Entered: 03/01/2021)
2021-03-118Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 18, 2021 to File the Parties' Joint Proposed Schedule by Department of State.(Weida, Jason) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-129Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 8 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 18, 2021 to File the Parties' Joint Proposed Schedule. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 03/12/2021)
2021-03-1810JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Text of modified Wiretapping Request)(Kortz, Mason) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-03-1911Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ENDORSED ORDER entered. APPROVING 10 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 03/19/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar