Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCenter for Food Safety v. Department of the Interior
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number3:2020cv08718
Date Filed2020-12-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu
PlaintiffCenter for Food Safety
Case DescriptionThe Center for Food Safety submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Interior for records concerning the involvement of Assistant Deputy Secretary for Fish, Wildlife and Parks Aurelia Skipworth in the 2018 decision to reverse the 2014 ban on the use of GE crops and neonicotinoid pesticides in the Refuge System. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CFS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of the Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-091COMPLAINT against Department of the Interior ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15296816.). Filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yundt, Victoria) (Filed on 12/9/2020) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
2020-12-092Proposed Summons. (Yundt, Victoria) (Filed on 12/9/2020) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
2020-12-093Certificate of Interested Entities by Center for Food Safety (Yundt, Victoria) (Filed on 12/9/2020) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
2020-12-094Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Food Safety (Yundt, Victoria) (Filed on 12/9/2020) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
2020-12-105Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/24/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020) (Entered: 12/10/2020)
2020-12-106Summons Issued as to Department of the Interior. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020) (Entered: 12/10/2020)
2020-12-107Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020) (Entered: 12/10/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar