Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03575
Date Filed2020-12-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning communications with Pfizer pertaining to the development of its corona virus vaccine. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantFOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DefendantCENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION
DefendantCENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-091COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7934886) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons as to USAO, # 4 Summons as to USAG, # 5 Summons as to HHS, # 6 Summons as to FDA, # 7 Summons as to CDC, # 8 Summons as to CMS)(Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
2020-12-092LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
2020-12-09Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
2020-12-093SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
2021-01-054RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/14/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/13/2021.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/14/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION served on 12/16/2020; CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES served on 12/22/2020; FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION served on 12/15/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES served on 12/14/2020 (Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 01/05/2021)
2021-01-065Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES (Truong, John) (Entered: 01/06/2021)
2021-01-07MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including February 12, 2021, to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/07/2021. (lcapm3) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
2021-01-076Consent MOTION for Order Setting Joint Status Report Deadline by CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES (Truong, John) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
2021-01-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Complaint due by 2/12/2021. (zjd) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
2021-01-08MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Order Setting Deadline for Joint Status Report. The Parties shall up to and including February 19, 2021, to submit a Joint Status Report to apprise the Court on the progress of this case. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/8/2021. (lcapm3) (Entered: 01/08/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar