Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNatural Resources Defense Council, Inc. v. United States Environmental Protection Agency
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2020cv10382
Date Filed2020-12-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Edgardo Ramos
PlaintiffNatural Resources Defense Council, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe Natural Resources Defense Council submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning communications regarding perchlorate. NRDC also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The EPA contacted NRDC to narrow the scope of its request. The agency disclosed 16 responsive records but after hearing nothing further from the agency, NRDC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Environmental Protection Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-091COMPLAINT against United States Environmental Protection Agency. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22958884)Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request).(Phillips, Lauren) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
2020-12-092CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Phillips, Lauren) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
2020-12-093REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Environmental Protection Agency, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc...(Phillips, Lauren) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
2020-12-094STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 16cv01251. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc...(Phillips, Lauren) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
2020-12-095RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc...(Phillips, Lauren) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
2020-12-10CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) (Entered: 12/10/2020)
2020-12-10Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 12/10/2020)
2020-12-10CASE REFERRED TO Judge Edgardo Ramos as possibly related to 16cv1251. (pc) (Entered: 12/10/2020)
2020-12-106ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Environmental Protection Agency..(pc) (Entered: 12/10/2020)
2020-12-11CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 2:16-cv-01251-ER. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) (Entered: 12/11/2020)
2020-12-11NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) (Entered: 12/11/2020)
2020-12-11Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (wb) (Entered: 12/11/2020)
2020-12-157NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Catherine Marlantes Rahm on behalf of Natural Resources Defense Council, Inc...(Rahm, Catherine) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar