Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCenter for Food Safety v. United States Department of Agriculture
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2020cv08812
Date Filed2020-12-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Sallie Kim
PlaintiffCenter for Food Safety
Case DescriptionThe Center for Food Safety submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Agriculture for records concerning the recently proposed ruled entitled Revision of Categorical Eligibility in the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. CFS contacted the agency to narrow the scope of its request. After hearing nothing further, CFS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Agriculture
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-111COMPLAINT against United States Department of Agriculture ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15308777.). Filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yundt, Victoria) (Filed on 12/11/2020) (Entered: 12/11/2020)
2020-12-112Proposed Summons. (Yundt, Victoria) (Filed on 12/11/2020) (Entered: 12/11/2020)
2020-12-113Certificate of Interested Entities by Center for Food Safety (Yundt, Victoria) (Filed on 12/11/2020) (Entered: 12/11/2020)
2020-12-114Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Food Safety (Yundt, Victoria) (Filed on 12/11/2020) (Entered: 12/11/2020)
2020-12-145Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/28/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2020) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2020-12-156Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2020) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
2020-12-157Summons Issued as to United States Department of Agriculture. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2020) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
2020-12-238CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Center for Food Safety.. (Yundt, Victoria) (Filed on 12/23/2020) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2021-01-069STIPULATION TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by United States Department of Agriculture. (Molinari, Gioconda) (Filed on 1/6/2021) (Entered: 01/06/2021)
2021-01-0610CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/20/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021) (Entered: 01/06/2021)
2021-01-0611SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center for Food Safety. United States Department of Agriculture served on 12/28/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Yundt, Victoria) (Filed on 1/6/2021) (Entered: 01/06/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar