Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWIGGINS v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03565
Date Filed2020-12-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffANTHONY W. WIGGINS
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE FOIA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-04Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 12/4/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) (Entered: 12/10/2020)
2020-12-041COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS filed by ANTHONY W. WIGGINS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (zmd) (Entered: 12/10/2020)
2020-12-042MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANTHONY W. WIGGINS (zmd) (Entered: 12/10/2020)
2020-12-043PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by ANTHONY W. WIGGINS. (zmd) (Entered: 12/10/2020)
2020-12-144ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $24.20 from Prison Account of ANTHONY W. WIGGINS and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/14/2020. (zmd) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
2020-12-29Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsb) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2021-01-045SUMMONS (4) Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, sent to U.S. Marshall service. (adh, ) (Entered: 01/04/2021)
2021-01-086RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 1/8/2021; EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS served on 1/8/2021, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/8/2021. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/8/2021. (Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/7/2021.) (ztth) (Entered: 01/11/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar