Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLlamas et al v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityOrlando
Case Number6:2020cv02264
Date Filed2020-12-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Anne C. Conway
PlaintiffNoelle Llamas
PlaintiffKen Klippenstein
Case DescriptionNoelle Llamas and Ken Klippenstein, a correspondent for The Nation, submitted two FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, the Department of State, the FBI, the Defense Intelligence Agency, the Office of Intelligence and Analysis, the Department of Energy, and the Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency for records concerning intelligence products and corresponding metadata. Llamas and Klippenstein also requested a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. However, after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, Llamas and Klippenstein filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantU.S. Customs and Border Protection
DefendantU.S. Department of State
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
DefendantDefense Intelligence Agency (DIA)
DefendantOffice of Intelligence and Analysis
DefendantU.S. Department of Energy
DefendantCybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-131COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17656517) filed by Ken Klippernstein and Noelle Llamas. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons State, # 3 Proposed Summons ICE, # 4 Proposed Summons I&A, # 5 Proposed Summons FBI, # 6 Proposed Summons DOE, # 7 Proposed Summons DIA, # 8 Proposed Summons CISA, # 9 Proposed Summons CBP, # 10 Proposed Summons Barr, # 11 Proposed Summons AUSA)(Bourdon, Elizabeth) Modified text on 12/14/2020 (TNP). (Entered: 12/13/2020)
2020-12-142NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:20-cv-2264-Orl-22DCI. (SJB) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2020-12-143SUMMONS issued as to Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency, Defense Intelligence Agency (DIA), Federal Bureau of Investigation, Office of Intelligence and Analysis, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Energy, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (TNP) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2020-12-144RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 2, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/28/2020. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/28/2020. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 12/14/2020. (counsel emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2020-12-195NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re 4 Related Case Order by Ken Klippenstein, Noelle Llamas. Related case(s): no (Bourdon, Elizabeth) Modified on 12/21/2020 (RDO). (Entered: 12/19/2020)
2020-12-196CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS and CORPORATE Disclosure Statement re 4 Interested Persons Order by Ken Klippenstein, Noelle Llamas. (Bourdon, Elizabeth) Modified on 12/21/2020 (RDO). (Entered: 12/19/2020)
2021-01-157Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Smart, Adam) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-158RELATED CASE ORDER, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing for Defendants. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/29/2021. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/29/2021. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 1/15/2021. (counsel mailed/emailed)(AKC) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-199ENDORSED ORDER granting 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 2/18/2021, Defendants shall respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/19/2021. (Irick, Daniel) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-1910NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 8 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency, Defense Intelligence Agency (DIA), Federal Bureau of Investigation, Office of Intelligence and Analysis, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Energy. Related case(s): y (Smart, Adam) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-2711CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 8 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 by Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency, Defense Intelligence Agency (DIA), Federal Bureau of Investigation, Office of Intelligence and Analysis, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Energy, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Smart, Adam) (Entered: 01/27/2021)
2021-01-2712Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Redesignate Case as Track One by All Defendants. (Smart, Adam) (Entered: 01/27/2021)
2021-02-0313ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion Re-Designate Case Track. The Motion is denied as moot to the extent the parties seek a different "track" designation. Motion is granted to the extent the parties are granted until 4/30/21 to file a case management report. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 2/2/2021. (copies mailed/emailed0 (AKC) (Entered: 02/03/2021)
2021-02-04Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Case management report due by 4/30/2021 (RDO) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-1814ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency, Defense Intelligence Agency (DIA), Federal Bureau of Investigation, Office of Intelligence and Analysis, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Energy, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Smart, Adam) (Entered: 02/18/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar