Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRHOADS et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03643
Date Filed2020-12-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffMARIAN A. RHOADS
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionMarian Rhoads and Judicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Army for records concerning communications between Michael Buck and six other Army employees pertaining to Rhoads' request for a reasonable accommodation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Rhoads and Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-141COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7953362) filed by MARIAN A. RHOADS, JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Defense)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2020-12-142LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2020-12-14Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmd) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2020-12-143SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2020-12-304RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/29/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/28/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
2020-12-305RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/29/20. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
2020-12-306RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 12/29/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar