Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03649
Date Filed2020-12-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffNATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE
Case DescriptionThe National Security Archive filed suit against the Department of State concerning a number of FOIA requests NSA had submitted to the State Department more than five years ago but still had not received a response.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-141COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7954029) filed by NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons State, # 3 Summons US Attorney, # 4 Summons Attorney General, # 5 Rule 7.1 Certificate)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2020-12-142LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE (adh, ) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2020-12-14Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2020-12-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons 2, # 2 Summons 3, # 3 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
2020-12-174STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/17/20. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2021-01-065NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 01/06/2021)
2021-01-146RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/22/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/21/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-197Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar