Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03653
Date Filed2020-12-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffAMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN
Case DescriptionThe American Wild Horse Campaign submitted a FOIA request tot the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning compliance checks done in Wyoming as part of the Adoption Incentive Program in 2019. Despite repeated contacts by AWHC concerning the status of its request, the agency claimed it had not received the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, AWHC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-141COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7955019) filed by AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/17/2020) (znmw). (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2020-12-14Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2020-12-152SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
2021-01-043NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Brudy-Everett on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 01/04/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar