Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWAHDAN v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03679
Date Filed2020-12-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffGHADA WAHDAN
Case DescriptionGhada Wahdan submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Wahdan filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-151COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7960942) filed by GHADA WAHDAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DHS, # 3 Summons USADC, # 4 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
2020-12-15Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
2020-12-162SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
2021-01-063RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 12/21/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DHS receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 01/06/2021)
2021-01-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/22/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/21/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USADC receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 01/06/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar