Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDroubi v. United States Department of Transportation
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2020cv10629
Date Filed2020-12-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen McMahon
PlaintiffLuna Droubi
Case DescriptionLuna Droubi submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Transportation's Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration for records concerning the semi-annual historical MCS-150 data from 2000-2019. Droubi also requested the data in a CSV format. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Droubi contacted the agency multiple times for a status check. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Droubi filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Transportation including its Component the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-161COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, including its Component the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23065587)Document filed by Luna Droubi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6).(Rankin, David) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
2020-12-162CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rankin, David) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
2020-12-163REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, including its Component the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Luna Droubi..(Rankin, David) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
2020-12-17***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Bruce Rankin. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: David Bruce Rankin. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (dnh) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-17CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(dnh) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-17Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (dnh) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-17Case Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-174ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Transportation..(dnh) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2021-01-045SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Luna Droubi served on 12/29/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Luna Droubi..(Rankin, David) (Entered: 01/04/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar